Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de Paola Grozo

Deceased

Bishop of Cajamarca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1852BornCajamarca
19 Sep 187523.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Trujillo, Peru
26 Sep 187523.5Ordained PriestPriest of Trujillo, Peru
21 Mar 191058.0AppointedBishop of Cajamarca, Peru
10 Jul 191058.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cajamarca, Peru
13 Mar 192876.0DiedBishop of Cajamarca, Peru

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Paola Grozo:
Bishop Francisco de Paola Grozo (born , died ) Bishop of Cajamarca

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 56
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 101

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013