Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Roco Campofrío, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Coria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1565BornAlcántara
17 Mar 162559.7AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
29 Jun 162560.0Ordained BishopBishop of Zamora, Spain
5 Jul 162762.0AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
8 Mar 163266.7AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
16 Sep 163570.2DiedBishop of Coria, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Roco Campofrío:
Bishop Juan Roco Campofrío O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Coria

  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 269, and Page 143
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 376
  • ob/c2+/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,500
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 147, Number 935

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015