Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wojciech Górski

Deceased

Bishop of Kielce


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1739³BornMaków
7 May 176930.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
14 May 176930.1Ordained PriestPriest
12 Dec 180364.7SelectedBishop of Kielce, Poland
26 Jun 180566.2ConfirmedBishop of Kielce, Poland
15 Oct 180970.5Ordained BishopBishop of Kielce, Poland
1 Feb 181878.8DiedBishop of Kielce, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wojciech Górski:
Bishop Wojciech Górski (born , died ) Bishop of Kielce

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,518
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 227

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013