Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jakub Gorecki, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bacău


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1619¹BornMinsk, Lithuania
31 Jan 167859.0AppointedBishop of Bacău, Romania
6 Feb 167859.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bacău, Romania
1679²60.0DiedBishop of Bacău, Romania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jakub Gorecki:
Bishop Jakub Gorecki O.P. (born 1619, died 1679) Bishop of Bacău

  • a bishop for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 111
  • c34: CB, 19 Sep 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1678, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015