Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felipe Antonio Solano Marín

Deceased

Bishop of Cuenca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1724BornCastelfrío de la Sierra
18 Apr 177450.1AppointedBishop of Ceuta, Spain
12 Jun 177450.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ceuta, Spain
1 Mar 177954.9AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
10 May 180076.1DiedBishop of Cuenca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Felipe Antonio Solano Marín:
Bishop Felipe Antonio Solano Marín (born , died ) Bishop of Cuenca

  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 91, Number 467
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1774, Number 30
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 178, and Page 377

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015