Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Maria Cardinal Bourbon Del Monte Santa Maria

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1549BornVenice, Italy
14 Dec 158839.4Elevated to Cardinal
9 Jan 158939.5InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
5 Apr 159141.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta
14 Feb 159242.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
24 Jan 161161.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
4 Jun 161262.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
16 Sep 161566.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
7 Dec 161566.4Ordained BishopBishop of Palestrina
29 Mar 162171.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
27 Sep 162374.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
27 Aug 162677.1DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Bourbon Del Monte Santa Maria:
Francesco Maria Cardinal Bourbon Del Monte Santa Maria (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

  • a bishop for 10.7 years
  • a cardinal for 37.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Dec 1588
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 52
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1615, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 21 Feb 2015