Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniele Giustiniani

Deceased

Bishop of Bergamo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1615Born
23 Jun 166449.0AppointedBishop of Bergamo, Italy
6 Jul 166449.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bergamo, Italy
11 Jan 169781.5DiedBishop of Bergamo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Daniele Giustiniani:
Bishop Daniele Giustiniani (born , died ) Bishop of Bergamo

  • a bishop for 32.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 113
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1664, Number 11
  • bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 13 Aug 2015