Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cherubino Malaspina, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1602¹Born
30 Aug 165553.6AppointedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
12 Sep 165553.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
14 Mar 1667¹65.2DiedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cherubino Malaspina
Bishop Cherubino Malaspina O.P. (born 1602, died ) Bishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSanti Cosma e Damiano, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 124
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1655, Number 27
  • ob: AT, 4 Nov 2016
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast