Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Genovés, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cebu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1765BornValencia, Spain
21 Oct 182458.9SelectedBishop of Cebu, Philippines
21 Mar 182559.3ConfirmedBishop of Cebu, Philippines
2 Jul 182660.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cebu, Philippines
1 Aug 182761.7DiedBishop of Cebu, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Francisco Genovés:
Bishop Francisco Genovés O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Cebu

  • a bishop for 1.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,088
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 286

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013