Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Francesco Maria Fenzi

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Corf¨

Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1738BornIadren
5 Jun 176224.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 Sep 177941.4AppointedArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece
21 Sep 177941.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece
3 Jan 181677.7ResignedArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece
23 Sep 181678.4AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
9 Jan 182990.7DiedArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Fenzi:
Patriarch Francesco Maria Fenzi (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Corf¨

  • a priest for 66.5 years
  • a bishop for 49.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 182
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 214

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015