Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop St. Melchor García Sanpedro, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale}, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1821Born
18 Aug 184625.3ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
29 May 184726.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
15 Apr 185331.9AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale}, Viet Nam
15 Apr 185331.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tricomia
16 Sep 185534.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tricomia
20 Jul 185736.2SucceededVicar Apostolic of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale}, Viet Nam
28 Jul 185837.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale}, Viet Nam
29 Apr 1951Beatified
19 Jun 1988Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Melchor García Sanpedro (VIAF: 88962941)
Bishop St. Melchor García Sanpedro O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCortes, Asturias, Diocese of Oviedo, Spain, Spain

  • a priest for 11.1 years
  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 565
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 163, Number 897
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1855, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 30 Dec 2016