Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Georges F. Garmou

Deceased

Archbishop of Mossul (Chaldean), Iraq


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1921Born
8 Dec 194524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Mossul (Chaldean), Iraq
23 Apr 198058.3AppointedArchbishop of Mossul (Chaldean), Iraq
14 Sep 198058.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mossul (Chaldean), Iraq
9 Sep 199977.7DiedArchbishop of Mossul (Chaldean), Iraq

MicroData Summary for Georges F. Garmou
Archbishop Georges F. Garmou (born , died ) Archbishop of Mossul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTelfek

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,401
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast