Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stéphane Katchou

Deceased

Bishop of Zaku (Chaldean), Iraq


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1929Born
17 Jun 195727.5Ordained PriestPriest
3 Oct 198050.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Bassorah {Basra} (Chaldean), Iraq
3 Oct 198050.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Anbar dei Caldei
30 Nov 198050.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Anbar dei Caldei
10 Nov 198151.9SucceededArchbishop of Bassorah {Basra} (Chaldean), Iraq
29 Nov 198353.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Zaku (Chaldean), Iraq
8 Nov 198757.9DiedBishop of Zaku (Chaldean), Iraq

MicroData Summary for Stéphane Katchou
Archbishop Stéphane Katchou (born , died ) Bishop of Zaku

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlquoch

  • a priest for 30.3 years
  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,402

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast