Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Eparchy of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Detroit (Chaldean)

Eparchia Sancti Thomas Apostoli Detroitensis Chaldaeorum



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Frank Yohana Kalabat, Bishop
  • Ibrahim Namo Ibrahim, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Apostolic Exarchate of United States of America (Chaldean)
11 January 1982ErectedApostolic Exarchate of United States of America (Chaldean) (erected)
Eparchy of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Detroit (Chaldean)
3 August 1985ErectedApostolic Exarchate of United States of America (Chaldean) Eparchy of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Detroit (Chaldean) (erected)
21 May 2002Territory LostEparchy of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Detroit (Chaldean) Eparchy of Saint Peter the Apostle of San Diego (Chaldean) (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Eparchy of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Detroit (Chaldean)
199050,00013133,846913ap1991
199970,00021213,33312ap2000
200075,55017174,44413ap2001
200185,80019194,51513ap2002
200290,00019194,7368014ap2003
200370,00012125,833607ap2004
200477,00012126,416657ap2005
2009102,80015156,853100108ap2010
2010103,90019195,468100108ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Jun 2014