Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gianantonio Della Beretta

Deceased

Bishop of Lodi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1733BornMilano
24 Sep 175724.1Ordained PriestPriest
28 Nov 178451.3SelectedBishop of Lodi, Italy
14 Feb 178551.5ConfirmedBishop of Lodi, Italy
24 Feb 178551.6Ordained BishopBishop of Lodi, Italy
16 Feb 181682.5DiedBishop of Lodi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gianantonio Della Beretta
Bishop Gianantonio Della Beretta (born , died ) Bishop of Lodi

  • a priest for 58.3 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 254
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 24 Feb 2016