Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Gallo

Deceased

Bishop of Massa Lubrense


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Nov 1632AppointedBishop of Massa Lubrense, Italy
8 Dec 1632Ordained BishopBishop of Massa Lubrense, Italy
4 Mar 1645DiedBishop of Massa Lubrense, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Gallo:
Bishop Alessandro Gallo (died ) Bishop of Massa Lubrense

  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 234
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 93, Number 555
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1632, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015