Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Martini

Deceased

Bishop of Ugento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1587¹Born
1613²26.0Ordained PriestPriest
3 Oct 163649.7SelectedBishop of Ugento, Italy
30 Mar 163750.2ConfirmedBishop of Ugento, Italy
26 Apr 163750.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ugento, Italy
1648¹61.0DiedBishop of Ugento, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Martini
Bishop Girolamo Martini (born 1587, died 1648) Bishop of Ugento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 35.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 351
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 99, Number 595
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1637, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast