Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Galati

Deceased

Archbishop of Santa Severina, Italy

Bishop of Crotone (Cotrone)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1869Born
14 Mar 189626.2Ordained PriestPriest of Mileto, Italy
15 Dec 191950.0AppointedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
14 Mar 192050.2Ordained BishopBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
1 Jul 192757.5AppointedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
29 Jan 192858.1InstalledArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
2 Jun 192858.4AppointedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
2 Mar 194676.2DiedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Galati
Archbishop Antonio Galati (born , died ) Archbishop of Santa Severina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVallelonga
Ordained BishopHoly Trinity, Cathedral, Mileto, Diocese of Mileto

  • a priest for 49.9 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1947
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1920, Number 10
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 89, Number 7,517

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast