Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop St. Francesco Antonio Domenico Fogolla, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Northern Shansi {Scian-Si Settentrionale}, China

Titular Bishop of Bagis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1839Born
1856²16.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
19 Sep 186323.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
28 Jun 189858.7AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Northern Shansi {Scian-Si Settentrionale}, China
28 Jun 189858.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Bagis
24 Aug 189858.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bagis
9 Jul 190060.7DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Northern Shansi {Scian-Si Settentrionale}, China
24 Nov 1946Beatified
1 Oct 2000Canonized

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for St. Francesco Antonio Domenico Fogolla (VIAF: 309917406)
Bishop St. Francesco Antonio Domenico Fogolla O.F.M. (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Northern Shansi {Scian-Si Settentrionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonterregio nella Garfagnana, Diocese of Pontremoli, Italy
Ordained Bishop8, rue de Puteaux, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 36.8 years
  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 138
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017