Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Nykke (Nix)

Deceased

Bishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1469Born
26 Feb 150131.7AppointedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
18 Apr 150131.8Ordained BishopBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
14 Jan 153666.6DiedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Richard Nykke (Nix)
Bishop Richard Nykke (Nix) (born , died ) Bishop of Norwich

  • a bishop for 34.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 205
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 95
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 468
  • ob: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1501, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 12 Apr 2018