Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ivan Skakoc (Scacoz)

Deceased

Bishop of Hvar (Lesina)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1752BornTragur
25 May 177522.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Nov 177523.0Ordained PriestPriest
4 Mar 182168.2SelectedBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia
27 Sep 182269.8ConfirmedBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia
16 Feb 182370.2Ordained BishopBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia
3 Apr 183784.3DiedBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Ivan Skakoc (Scacoz):
Bishop Ivan Skakoc (Scacoz) (born , died ) Bishop of Hvar (Lesina)

  • a priest for 61.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 304

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015