Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop József Fengler, Sch. P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Győr (Raab)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1733³BornWien
18 Sep 175623.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of the Pious Schools
16 Jan 175723.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Pious Schools
21 Aug 178753.9SelectedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
10 Mar 178854.4ConfirmedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
13 Apr 178854.5Ordained BishopBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
4 Feb 180268.3DiedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for József Fengler
Bishop József Fengler Sch. P. (born , died ) Bishop of Győr (Raab)

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 241
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,785
  • ob/c2+: ATh
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1788, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 15 Feb 2016