Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miklós Milassin, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1738³BornCsavoly
24 Aug 176022.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Observant Friars Minor
19 Mar 176122.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
19 Jan 179051.7SelectedBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
21 Jun 179052.1ConfirmedBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
8 Sep 179052.3Ordained BishopBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
2 Jul 181173.1DiedBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miklós Milassin
Bishop Miklós Milassin O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale)

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 72
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1790, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 30 Sep 2016