Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bernardino Cardinal Honorati

Deceased

Bishop of Senigallia

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1724BornIesi
31 Dec 175935.5Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jan 176035.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Side
25 Feb 176035.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Side
23 Jun 177752.9Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jul 177753.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Senigallia, Italy
28 Jul 177753.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
12 Aug 180783.1DiedBishop of Senigallia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Honorati:
Cardinal Bernardino Honorati (born , died ) Bishop of Senigallia

  • a priest for 47.6 years
  • a bishop for 47.5 years
  • a cardinal for 30.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Jun 1777

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013