Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop László Esterházy

Deceased

Bishop of Rožňava


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1769³BornSopron, Hungary
11 Jun 179122.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
26 Jul 179223.1Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 181041.5SelectedBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
26 Sep 181445.3ConfirmedBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
23 Jul 181546.1Ordained BishopBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
11 Sep 182455.3DiedBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for László Esterházy:
Bishop László Esterházy (born , died ) Bishop of Rožňava

  • a priest for 32.1 years
  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,368
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 325
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • c2: CB, 2 Jun 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,715

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013