Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Donatus Edet Akpan

Bishop of Ogoja, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1952 Born
12 Oct 198533.1Ordained PriestPriest of Ikot Ekpene, Nigeria
9 Apr 201764.6AppointedBishop of Ogoja, Nigeria
7 Jul 201764.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ogoja, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Donatus Edet Akpan
Bishop Donatus Edet Akpan (born ) Bishop of Ogoja

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIkot Ada Utor, Diocese of Ikot Ekpene
Ordained BishopSt. Thomas College Field, Ogoja, Diocese of Ogoja

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ogoja.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Apr 2017
  • ob: CB, 2 May 2017
  • c2+: CB, 7 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Jul 2017