Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Matteo Lucifero

Deceased

Bishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1496¹Born
10 Sep 152226.6AppointedBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
17 Jan 152428.0Ordained BishopBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
14 Nov 152428.8AppointedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
1551²55.0DiedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Matteo Lucifero
Bishop Giovanni Matteo Lucifero (born 1496, died 1551) Bishop of Crotone (Cotrone)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSacristy, Santa Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 180, and Page 323
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,524, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast