Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Lucas Moncalvi

Deceased

Bishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1600¹BornCalvi
16 Jan 164040.0AppointedBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy
29 Jan 164040.0Ordained BishopBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy
9 Jun 166969.4DiedBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Lucas Moncalvi:
Bishop Giovanni Lucas Moncalvi (died ) Bishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia)

  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 199
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1640, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 15 Mar 2015