Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Maria Durazzo, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Savona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1643¹BornGenova
166118.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
20 Dec 168340.9AppointedBishop of Savona, Italy
27 Dec 168340.9Ordained BishopBishop of Savona, Italy
3 Jun 172279.4DiedBishop of Savona, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Maria Durazzo:
Bishop Vincenzo Maria Durazzo C.R. (born 1643, died ) Bishop of Savona

  • a bishop for 38.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 344
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1683, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015