Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Dorrian

Deceased

Bishop of Down and Connor


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1814BornDownpatrick
23 Sep 183723.5Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 186046.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
22 Jun 186046.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Gabala
19 Aug 186046.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gabala
4 May 186551.1SucceededBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
3 Nov 188571.6DiedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Patrick Dorrian:
Bishop Patrick Dorrian (born , died ) Bishop of Down and Connor

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 254, and Page 279

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013