Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista de Martino di Pietradoro, Sch. P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy

Bishop of Alife


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1758Born
9 Jun 178123.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Pious Schools
22 Mar 182465.9SelectedBishop of Alife, Italy
22 Mar 182465.9SelectedBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
3 May 182466.0ConfirmedBishop of Alife, Italy
3 May 182466.0ConfirmedBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
9 May 182466.0Ordained BishopBishop of Alife, Italy
1 May 182668.0DiedBishop of Alife, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista de Martino di Pietradoro
Bishop Giovanni Battista de Martino di Pietradoro Sch. P. (born , died ) Bishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 68
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1824, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast