Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Louis Joseph Derouet, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Lower French Congo {Congo Francese Inferiore}

Titular Bishop of Camachus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1866BornSaint-Denis de Villenette, France
20 Dec 189024.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
2 Jan 190740.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Lower French Congo {Congo Francese Inferiore}
2 Jan 190740.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Camachus
3 Feb 190741.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Camachus
4 Mar 191448.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Lower French Congo {Congo Francese Inferiore}

MicroData Summary for Jean Louis Joseph Derouet:
Bishop Jean Louis Joseph Derouet C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Lower French Congo {Congo Francese Inferiore}

  • a priest for 23.2 years
  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 105

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013