Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tsegaye Keneni Derara

Vicar Apostolic of Soddo

Titular Bishop of Maximiana in Byzacena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1943 BornMetcha Borodo
13 Jul 197632.6Ordained PriestPriest of Addis Abeba (Ethiopian), Ethiopia
11 Oct 201369.9AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Soddo, Ethiopia
11 Oct 201369.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Maximiana in Byzacena
24 Nov 201370.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maximiana in Byzacena
12 Jan 201470.1SucceededVicar Apostolic of Soddo, Ethiopia

MicroData Summary for Tsegaye Keneni Derara:
Bishop Tsegaye Keneni Derara (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Soddo

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Soddo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Oct 2013
  • ob/c2+: CB, 20 Oct 2013
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 2013, Number 150
  • s: CB, 12 Jan 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 12 Jan 2014