Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Daumal Serra

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Barcelona

Titular Bishop of Mathara in Proconsulari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1912BornBadalona
30 Jul 193927.3Ordained PriestPriest of Barcelona, Spain
22 Oct 196856.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Barcelona, Spain
22 Oct 196856.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Mathara in Proconsulari
14 Dec 196856.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mathara in Proconsulari
30 Oct 198775.6RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Barcelona, Spain
10 Feb 200895.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Barcelona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ramón Daumal Serra:
Bishop Ramón Daumal Serra (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Barcelona

  • a priest for 68.5 years
  • a bishop for 39.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013