Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raffaele Serena

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}

Titular Bishop of Chariopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1776BornNapoli
21 Sep 179922.8Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
2 Oct 183760.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
2 Oct 183760.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Chariopolis
15 Oct 183760.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chariopolis
1858²81.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Serena:
Bishop Raffaele Serena (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 58.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 148

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013