Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume-Philippe de Herzelles

Deceased

Bishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1684³BornCastello di Nivell
27 Feb 170622.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
18 Dec 170622.9Ordained PriestPriest of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
5 Dec 174258.8SelectedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
11 Mar 174359.1ConfirmedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
19 May 174359.3Ordained BishopBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
2 Sep 174460.6DiedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillaume-Philippe de Herzelles:
Bishop Guillaume-Philippe de Herzelles (born , died ) Bishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}

  • a priest for 37.7 years
  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1744
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 89
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015