Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhlemus Delvaux

Deceased

Bishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1681³Born
19 Dec 170524.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
3 Apr 170624.6Ordained PriestPriest
20 Aug 173049.0SelectedBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium
31 Mar 173250.6ConfirmedBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium
25 May 173250.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium
12 Oct 176180.2DiedBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wilhlemus Delvaux
Bishop Wilhlemus Delvaux (born , died ) Bishop of Ypres (Ieper)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBléhen

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1734
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 447
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1732, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast