Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maximiliaan-Antoon van der Noot

Deceased

Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1685³BornMalines
24 Mar 170822.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
15 Mar 171024.2Ordained PriestPriest
7 Apr 174256.2SelectedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
26 Nov 174256.9ConfirmedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
20 Jan 174357.0Ordained BishopBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
27 Sep 177084.7DiedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Maximiliaan-Antoon van der Noot:
Bishop Maximiliaan-Antoon van der Noot (born , died ) Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}

  • a priest for 60.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1770
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 223
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015