Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cayetano Antonio Cuadrillero Mota

Deceased

Bishop of León


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1724BornPalazuelo de Vedija
18 Jul 176338.9AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
28 Aug 176339.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
15 Dec 177753.3AppointedBishop of León, Spain
3 Apr 180075.6DiedBishop of León, Spain

MicroData Summary for Cayetano Antonio Cuadrillero Mota
Bishop Cayetano Antonio Cuadrillero Mota (born , died ) Bishop of León

  • a bishop for 36.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 166, and Page 257
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 80, Number 402
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1763, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016