Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pascual de los Herreros

Deceased

Bishop of León


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1692BornMilmarcos
23 Aug 176270.3AppointedBishop of León, Spain
10 Oct 176270.4Ordained BishopBishop of León, Spain
3 Mar 177077.8DiedBishop of León, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pascual de los Herreros:
Bishop Pascual de los Herreros (born , died ) Bishop of León

  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 80, Number 399
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1762, Number 20
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 257

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Nov 2015