Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Federico Cardinal Cornaro (Sr.), O.S.Io.Hieros. †

Deceased

Bishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1531Born
27 Mar 156028.7AppointedBishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia
15 Jan 156129.5AppointedBishop of Bergamo, Italy
19 Jul 157746.1AppointedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
18 Dec 158554.5Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jan 158654.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
4 Oct 159059.3DiedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Federico Cornaro (Sr.) (VIAF: 80571550)
Federico Cardinal Cornaro (Sr.) O.S.Io.Hieros. (born , died ) Bishop of Padova {Padua}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)S. Silvestro al Quirinale, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Current)Cathedral, Padova, Diocese of Padova {Padua}

  • a cardinal for 4.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1585
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 267, and Page 316
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1560, Number 24*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018