Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi Cardinal Cornaro

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Zadar (Zara), Croatia

Cardinal-Priest of San Marco

Chamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1517Born
20 Nov 155134.7Elevated to Cardinal
4 Dec 155134.8InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Teodoro
25 Jun 155437.3AppointedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
17 Jul 155538.4ResignedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
13 Mar 156043.0AppointedAdministrator of Bergamo, Italy
15 Jan 156143.9AppointedAdministrator of Trogir (Traù), Croatia
26 Feb 156144.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Teodoro
21 Jun 156447.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
18 Apr 156750.1ResignedAdministrator of Trogir (Traù), Croatia
2 Jun 156851.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Vitale
9 Feb 156951.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
10 May 157053.2AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber
9 Jun 157053.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
10 May 158467.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Zadar (Zara), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Luigi Cornaro (VIAF: 308179014)
Luigi Cardinal Cornaro (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Zadar (Zara)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria a Trevi, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 32.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Nov 1551
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 316
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1554, Number 33*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast