Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Marco Cardinal Cornaro

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Titular Patriarch of Constantinople

Bishop of Padova {Padua}

Administrator of Verona

Archpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1482²Born
28 Sep 150018.7Elevated to Cardinal
5 Oct 150018.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Octaviae)
29 Nov 150321.9AppointedAdministrator of Verona, Italy
11 Dec 150321.9AppointedBishop of Famagusta, Cyprus
1 Jul 150422.5ResignedBishop of Famagusta, Cyprus
Jul 1506³24.5AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
30 Oct 150725.8ResignedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
19 Mar 151331.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
4 Apr 151432.2AppointedBishop of Nemosia (Limasol), Greece
22 Mar 151634.2ResignedBishop of Nemosia (Limasol), Greece
9 Mar 151735.1AppointedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
24 Jan 151937.0AppointedAdministrator of Nardò, Italy
Sep 1520³38.6AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}
20 Feb 152139.1ResignedAdministrator of Nardò, Italy
11 Jun 152139.4AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
14 Dec 152341.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
1 Apr 152442.2Ordained PriestPriest
20 May 152442.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
15 Jun 152442.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
24 Jul 152442.5DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Marco Cornaro (VIAF: 47669323)
Marco Cardinal Cornaro (born 1482, died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
Ordained PriestCamera Consistorialis, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Giorgio Maggiore, Church, Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
Buried Place (Current)S. Salvatore Chapel, S. Marco, Basilica, Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

  • a priest for .3 years
  • a cardinal for 23.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 28 Sep 1500
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 177, and Page 331
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 267, and Page 194
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 256, and Page 259
  • op/c1: CB, 12 Dec 2017
  • op/c1: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1505, Number 16*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast