Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop St. Daniele Comboni, F.S.C.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Central Africa {Africa Centrale}, Sudan

Titular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Isauria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1831Born
17 Dec 185423.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Verona, Italy
31 Dec 185423.7Ordained PriestPriest of Verona, Italy
26 May 187241.1AppointedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Central Africa {Africa Centrale}, Sudan
31 Jul 187746.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Central Africa {Africa Centrale}, Sudan
31 Jul 187746.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Isauria
12 Aug 187746.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Isauria
10 Oct 188150.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Central Africa {Africa Centrale}, Sudan
17 Mar 1996Beatified
5 Oct 2003Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Daniele Comboni (VIAF: 46799291)
Bishop St. Daniele Comboni F.S.C.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Central Africa {Africa Centrale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLimone sul Garda, Diocese of Brescia, Italy
Ordained BishopPropaganda, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 26.7 years
  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/beat: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 209
  • od/c0: CB, 12 Sep 2015
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1877, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 Mar 2017