Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Placide Colliard

Deceased

Bishop of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1876Born
21 Jul 190125.4Ordained PriestPriest of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland
6 Dec 191539.8AppointedBishop of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland
9 Jan 191639.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland
10 Feb 192044.0DiedBishop of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Placide Colliard
Bishop Placide Colliard (born , died ) Bishop of Lausanne et Genève

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAttalens

  • a priest for 18.5 years
  • a bishop for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast