Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Giuseppe Camuzzi

Deceased

Bishop of Orvieto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1653BornTolmezzo
24 Jan 169542.1AppointedBishop of Orvieto, Italy
6 Feb 169542.1Ordained BishopBishop of Orvieto, Italy
Sep 169542.7DiedBishop of Orvieto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Giuseppe Camuzzi:
Bishop Giovanni Giuseppe Camuzzi Bishop of Orvieto

  • a bishop for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013