Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Folgori

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Nazareth


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1640BornNapoli
7 Feb 169555.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth
19 Mar 169555.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nazareth
Aug 170666.5DiedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth

MicroData Summary for Domenico Folgori:
Archbishop Domenico Folgori , Titular Archbishop of Nazareth

  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 282

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015