Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Ciccolo Rinaldi

Deceased

Bishop of Trapani


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1801BornMessina
20 Dec 182322.6Ordained PriestPriest
27 May 185352.1SelectedBishop of Trapani, Italy
27 Jun 185352.1ConfirmedBishop of Trapani, Italy
3 Jul 185352.2Ordained BishopBishop of Trapani, Italy
23 Oct 185352.5InstalledBishop of Trapani, Italy
8 Jul 187473.2DiedBishop of Trapani, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Ciccolo Rinaldi:
Bishop Vincenzo Ciccolo Rinaldi (born , died ) Bishop of Trapani

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 251

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013