Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Martín Ibáñez y Villanueva, O.SS.T. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Reggio Calabria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1620¹BornCuencia, Spain
16 Jun 167050.4AppointedBishop of Gaeta, Italy
22 Jun 167050.4Ordained BishopBishop of Gaeta, Italy
27 May 167555.4AppointedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
Sep 1695³75.6DiedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martín Ibáñez y Villanueva:
Archbishop Martín Ibáñez y Villanueva O.SS.T. (born 1620, died Sep 1695) Archbishop of Reggio Calabria

  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 205, Number 1,285
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1670, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015