Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dionisio Castaño y Bermúdez

Deceased

Bishop of Gerona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1769Born
1795¹25.7Ordained PriestPriest of Toledo, Spain
24 Feb 182555.8SelectedBishop of Gerona, Spain
27 Jun 182556.2ConfirmedBishop of Gerona, Spain
30 Dec 182556.7Ordained BishopBishop of Gerona, Spain
24 Apr 183465.0DiedBishop of Gerona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dionisio Castaño y Bermúdez (VIAF: 304565294)
Bishop Dionisio Castaño y Bermúdez (born , died ) Bishop of Gerona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNovés
Ordained BishopMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 203
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 143, Number 777
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1825, Number 31
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 68, Number 5,355

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast